EP0391157 - Interface module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flach, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Pfistermeisterstrasse 47 D-8450 Amberg / DE | [1990/41] | Application number, filing date | 90105458.5 | 22.03.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | DE19893910719 | 03.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3910719 | [1990/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0391157 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0391157 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/42 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/41] | G06F13/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Schnittstellenmodul | [1990/41] | English: | Interface module | [1990/41] | French: | Module d'interface | [1990/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0229700 ; | [A]US4293909 | [X] - 11TH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON CIRCUITS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, Pacific Grove, CA, 7. - 9. November 1977, Seiten 477-480; T. NISHIMUKAI et al.: "Universal I/O device controller by using programmable logic arrays (PLA)" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 21, Nr. 1, Juni 1978, Seiten 82-83, New York, US; R.V. SZYMANSKI et al.: "Adaptive interconnections" | [A] - ELEKTRONIK, Band 36, Nr. 3, 6. Februar 1987, Seiten 141-144,146-148, München, DE; P. AMMON: "ASIC - was, wie, wann? 1. Teil: Eine Produktfamilie stellt sich vor" |