EP0392478 - Apparatus for packaging grouped packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KVM Kontroll- und Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH & Co. KG Im Steinernen Kreuz 31 D-7131 Wurmberg / DE | [1990/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Günther Glasbronnenstrasse 12 D-7131 Neubärental / DE | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Frank, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Frank, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106891.6 | 10.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | DE19893911732 | 11.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3911732 | [1990/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0392478 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392478 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B5/02, B65B43/14 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
B65B43/145 (EP);
B65B5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/02] |
Former [1990/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abpackung von gruppierten Einzelpackungen | [1990/42] | English: | Apparatus for packaging grouped packages | [1990/42] | French: | Installation pour emballer des paquets groupés | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, GR, LU | 13.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.06.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.1990 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.07.1992 | [1993/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1162553 (HASKON INC [US]); | [Y]US3783752 (LANGEN M, et al); | [X]FR2339532 (TETRA PAK DEV [CH]); | [X]DE1926223 (QUADALTI CESARE); | [A]FR2126157 (LINCRUSTA); | [A]GB615100 (WILLIAM EWAN MACKENZIE, et al) | Examination | DE2507022 |