EP0399200 - Functionally modifiable cable television converter system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE 181 West Madison Street Chicago Illinois 60602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE 181 West Madison Street Chicago, Illinois 60602 / US | ||
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states GI CORPORATION 2200 Byberry Road Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US | ||
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 767 Fifth Avenue New York New York 10153 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kauffman, Marc W. 420 Franklin Avenue Cheltenham, Pennsylvania 19012 / US | 02 /
Miller, Michael R. 98 Onieda Avenue Moorestown, New Jersey 08057 / US | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90107108.4 | 12.04.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | US19890357174 | 25.05.1989 Original published format: US 357174 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399200 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399200 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399200 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
H04N21/4349 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4383 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
H04N21/4424 (EP,US);
H04N21/4586 (EP,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,US);
H04N21/818 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Kabelfernsehkonvertersystem mit modifizierbarer Funktion | [1990/48] | English: | Functionally modifiable cable television converter system | [1990/48] | French: | Système convertisseur pour télévision par câble fonctionnellement modifiable | [1990/48] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/25: (deleted) | EPB 1997/25: (deleted) | EPB 1997/25: (deleted) | EPB 1996/35: Teilanmeldung 96108778.0 eingereicht am 31/05/96 | EPB 1996/35: Divisional application 96108778.0 filed on 31/05/96 | EPB 1996/35: Demande divisionnaire 96108778.0 déposée le 31/05/96 | Examination procedure | 06.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96108778.0 / EP0732850 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2118750 (TELECABLE VIDEOTRON LTD); | [X]EP0132401 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0187973 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [X]US4623920 (DUFRESNE MICHEL [CA], et al); | [A]US4710955 (KAUFFMAN MARC W [US]) | [A] - FUNKSCHAU, no. 5, 24th February 1989, pages 59-62; C. SCHEPERS: "Der Schlüssel zum Scrambling-Problem?" |