|
08.02.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
26.09.2000 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.09.2000 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.08.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.01.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1997 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1997 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1995 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.07.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.06.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1995 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.1995 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.1994 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.12.1994 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1994 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
13.09.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.09.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.10.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1990 |
Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1990 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Invitation to confirm the patent application filed by fax |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.05.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
36 |