|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
15.10.1999 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.10.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.1999 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.09.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1995 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.04.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.12.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |