|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1999 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
33 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1999 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
16.04.1999 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.04.1999 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.03.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.1999 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.03.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1998 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1998 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1998 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1998 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1998 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1998 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1998 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.09.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.1998 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Annex |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1996 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
30.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
110 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1995 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1995 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.1995 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.02.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1995 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
43 |
|
13.12.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
43 |
|
13.12.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
42 |
|
05.12.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.12.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
30 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
66 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
37 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.06.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1993 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
32 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
70 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
67 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
51 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1993 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1993 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Communication of notices of intervention |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.06.1992 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1992 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1991 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1990 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
06.12.1990 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
70 |