EP0420218 - Submersible pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ota-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ota-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Shinichiro 2529-4, Hagisono Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/14] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118513.2 | 26.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | JP19890249861 | 26.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24986189 | JP19900195775 | 23.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19577590 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0420218 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0420218 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/62, F04D13/08, H02K5/12 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
F04D29/4266 (EP,US);
F04D13/08 (KR);
F04D13/086 (EP,US);
F04D29/426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Tauchpumpe | [1991/14] | English: | Submersible pump | [1991/14] | French: | Pompe submersible | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 13.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.03.1994 | LU | 30.09.1994 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62265493 ; | [A]FR2563060 (GUINARD POMPES [FR]); | [A]US4549849 (JENSEN NIELS D [DK], et al); | [A]DE3609311 (HOMA PUMPENFABRIK GMBH [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 145 (M-693)(2992) 06 May 1988, & JP-A-62 265493 (KUBOTA LTD) 18 November 1987,, & JP62265493 A 19871118 |