EP0422495 - Styrene polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Akikazu 1-34, Kitade 3-chome Tadaoka-cho, Semboku-gun, Osaka / JP | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118956.3 | 04.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890264996 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26499689 | JP19890264997 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26499789 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422495 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422495 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/12, C08L25/06, C08L77/00, C08K9/04 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08L25/04 (KR);
C08G65/485 (EP,US);
C08L71/126 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
H05K1/0373 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/06, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L71/126, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L71/126, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L71/126, C08L77/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | Styrolpolymerisate enthaltende Zusammensetzung | [1991/16] | English: | Styrene polymer composition | [1991/16] | French: | Composition à base de polymère de styrène | [1991/16] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/24: Teilanmeldung 94104999.1 eingereicht am 04/10/90 | EPB 1994/24: Divisional application 94104999.1 filed on 04/10/90 | EPB 1994/24: Demande divisionnaire 94104999.1 déposée le 04/10/90 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 18.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94104999.1 / EP0608007 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.1999 | BE | 08.09.1999 | [2000/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP01075561 ; | [A]JP63101452 ; | [A]EP0226910 (BORG WARNER CHEMICALS INC [US]); | [A]EP0314146 (MONTEDIPE SPA [IT]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.111, no.12, 18th September 1989, page 74, abstract no. 98736c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-01 075 561 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO.,LTD) 22 March 1989, & JP01075561 A 19890322 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.109, no.16, 17th October 1988, page 44, abstract no. 130300c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 101 452 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO.,LTD) 6 May 1988, & JP63101452 A 19880506 |