|
14.05.1999 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1999 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1999 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
18.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.1995 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1995 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.01.1995 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.01.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.1993 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.1990 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.11.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.11.1990 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1990 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.10.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |