EP0442093 - Fixing of an elastomeric hose to a fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thurow, Gerhard Malchensbrücke 7B W-3008 Garbsen 1 / DE | 02 /
Ney, Manfred Stöckener Strasse 60 W-3016 Seelze 2 / DE | [1993/37] |
Former [1991/34] | 01 /
Thurow, Gerhard Malchensbrücke 7B W-3008 Garbsen 1 / DE | ||
02 /
Ney, Manfred Stöckener strasse 60 W-3016 Seelze 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 90124370.9 | 17.12.1990 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | DE19904004451 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4004451 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442093 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442093 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/04, F16J3/06 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
F16F9/0454 (EP);
F16J3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Befestigung eines Schlauchkörpers aus elastomerem Werkstoff an einer Armatur | [1993/37] | English: | Fixing of an elastomeric hose to a fitting | [1991/34] | French: | Fixation d'une manche en élastomère à une armature | [1991/34] |
Former [1991/34] | Befestigung eines Schlaufkörpers aus elastomerem Werkstoff an einer Armatur | Examination procedure | 20.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3788628 (HOTZ K, et al); | [A]EP0274615 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]); | [A]DE2905791 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]DE282869 |