EP0491969 - Lung ventilator with a flow rate dependent trigger threshold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For:SE
Siemens-Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna 1 / SE | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olsson, Sven Gunnar, Dipl.-Ing. Villa Fortuna S-232 00 Arlöv / SE | 02 /
Rydgren, Göran, Dipl.-Ing. Strandängsvägen 4 S-230 44 Bunkeflostrand / SE | 03 /
Lindén, Dan, Dipl.-Ing. Dianavägen 35 S-115 43 Stockholm / SE | [1992/27] | Application number, filing date | 90124930.0 | 20.12.1990 | [1992/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491969 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491969 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/00 (US);
A61M16/1015 (EP,US);
A61M16/204 (EP,US);
A61M16/205 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Beatmungsgerät mit vom Patientengasfluss abhängiger Triggerempfindlichkeit | [1992/27] | English: | Lung ventilator with a flow rate dependent trigger threshold | [1992/27] | French: | Appareil respiratoire avec un seuil de détection d'inhalation dépendant du débit respiratoire | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0402951 (AKASHI MANABU [JP]); | [A]EP0046570 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]FR2596279 (BOC SA [FR]) | Examination | - Puritan Bennetts Option 50 (20535A 10-86) |