EP0415474 - Device for optimising the operating range of an A/D converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groen, Robertus Wilhelmus Catharina c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202166.6 | 10.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | NL19890002058 | 14.08.1989 Original published format: NL 8902058 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0415474 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415474 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B7/125, G11B7/13 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (KR);
G11B7/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (EP,US);
G11B7/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/10] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Optimieren des Arbeitsgebiets eines A/D-Wandlers | [1991/10] | English: | Device for optimising the operating range of an A/D converter | [1991/10] | French: | Dispositif pour optimiser la gamme de fonctionnement d'un convertisseur analogique-numérique | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 03.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4093961 (KANAMARU HITOSHI); | [AD]EP0138273 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |