|
19.05.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
28.08.2003 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
23 |
|
05.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2000 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.05.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.12.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.12.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1998 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.07.1997 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
02.10.1996 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |