EP0416717 - Roll stand for a planetary rolling mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fink, Peter, Dr. mont. Dipl.-Ing. Juistweg 40 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | 02 /
Figge, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Defreggerstrasse 22 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1991/11] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 90250213.7 | 16.08.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | DE19893928962 | 29.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3928962 | [1991/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416717 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416717 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416717 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21B13/20 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
B21B13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/11] | Title | German: | Walzgerüst für ein Planetenwalzwerk | [1991/11] | English: | Roll stand for a planetary rolling mill | [1991/11] | French: | Cage de laminoir pour un laminoir planétaire | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1140534 |