EP0390589 - Stratified-combustion internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Tetsuro 18, Gosho-cho, Katsura, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Danno, Yoshiaki 1, Nishisakaidani-cho, 2-chome Oharano, Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Ando, Hiromitsu 15, Aza Achika, Hashime-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303438.7 | 30.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | JP19890081015 | 31.03.1989 Original published format: JP 8101589 | JP19900050474 | 01.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5047490 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390589 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390589 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390589 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02B17/00 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
F02B17/00 (EP,US);
F02B31/00 (EP,US);
F02B31/085 (EP,US);
F02B31/087 (EP,US);
F02F1/242 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02B2023/085 (EP,US);
F02B2031/006 (US);
F02B2275/48 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/40] | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine mit Schichtverbrennung | [1990/40] | English: | Stratified-combustion internal combustion engine | [1990/40] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne à combustion stratifiée | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63201313 ; | [Y]FR1449256 (FORD FRANCE); | [A]US4494504 (YAGI SHIZUO [JP], et al); | [Y]DE3444356 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3713628 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]DE3828742 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |