EP0398502 - Method and system for providing a colour match between a scanned colour test pattern and the respective printout of a colour printer, using a closed control loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/47] | Method and system for providing closed loop color control between a scanned color image and the output of a color printer | ||
[1996/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, C.S. 3341 McCormick Way Boise, Idaho 83709 / US | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90304134.1 | 18.04.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890353859 | 17.05.1989 Original published format: US 353859 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0398502 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0398502 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398502 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
H04N1/40006 (EP,US);
H04N1/46 (KR);
H04N1/6033 (EP,US);
H04N1/6036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Farbabgleich zwischen einem abgetasteten Testbild und dem zugehörigen Ausdruck eines Farbdruckers, mittels einer geschlossenen Regelschleife | [1996/25] | English: | Method and system for providing a colour match between a scanned colour test pattern and the respective printout of a colour printer, using a closed control loop | [1996/25] | French: | Procédé et système pour l'égalisation en couleurs en boucle fermée entre une mire couleur échantillonnée et la sortie correspondante d'une imprimante en couleurs | [1996/25] |
Former [1990/47] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Farbaussteuerung in geschlossenem Regelkreis zwischem einem angetasteten Farbbild und dem Ausdruck eines Farbdruckers | ||
Former [1990/47] | Method and system for providing closed loop color control between a scanned color image and the output of a color printer | ||
Former [1990/47] | Procédé et système pour la commande de la couleur en boucle fermée entre une image en couleurs balayée et l'impression d'une imprimante en couleurs | Examination procedure | 02.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4839722 (BARRY MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [A]US4710785 (MILLS BORDEN H [US]); | [A]EP0144188 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [AD]US4477833 (CLARK DAVID A [US], et al) |