EP0400979 - Speakerphone with echo canceller-suppressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/49] | Echo canceler-suppressor speakerphone | ||
[1995/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1990/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ford, William Albert 4 Grant Street Farmingdale, New Jersey 07727 / US | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90305862.6 | 30.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | US19890358030 | 30.05.1989 Original published format: US 358030 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400979 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400979 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400979 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04M9/08, H04B3/20 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
H04M9/082 (EP,US);
H04M9/08 (KR);
H04B3/20 (EP,US);
H04M2201/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1990/49] | Title | German: | Fernsprechgerät mit Freisprecheinrichtung und Kompensator-Unterdrücker für Echos | [1995/43] | English: | Speakerphone with echo canceller-suppressor | [1995/43] | French: | Téléphone à haut-parleur avec annuleur-suppresseur d'échos | [1995/43] |
Former [1990/49] | Fernsprechgerät mit Echounterdrückung | ||
Former [1990/49] | Echo canceler-suppressor speakerphone | ||
Former [1990/49] | Téléphone à haut-parleur suppresseur d'écho | Examination procedure | 08.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2005968 (CIT ALCATEL); | [X]WO8603912 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [X]US4600815 (HORNA OTAKAR A [US]); | [X]EP0282393 (CONNAN JEAN LOUIS [FR], et al) |