|
06.08.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.10.2001 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.05.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
04.02.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1998 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.09.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.07.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1998 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.07.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1998 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
108 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.06.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.06.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.06.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
72 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
31.01.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.08.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.04.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.02.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.12.1993 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
214 |
|
31.08.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.08.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
04.08.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
28.05.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.03.1992 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1990 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
07.09.1990 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |