|
21.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.01.2005 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.01.2005 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.10.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.08.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.08.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.05.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
26.05.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.05.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.05.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2001 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
23 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
21 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1999 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1999 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1999 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
166 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
04.12.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.06.1993 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1993 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.1993 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1993 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1990 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1990 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1990 |
Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1990 |
Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
17.09.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |