|
05.04.2000 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.11.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1999 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.03.1996 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.1996 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.11.1994 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.09.1994 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
46 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.05.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
93 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
194 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
178 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
15.06.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.1992 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1992 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.1992 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
25.01.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.01.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1990 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1990 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.1990 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |