|
07.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.06.2002 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.04.2002 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.02.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.10.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1999 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.06.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
22 |
|
08.03.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.12.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.12.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
02.02.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.04.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.02.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.1992 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1991 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1991 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.1991 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.08.1991 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1990 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.1990 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1990 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.11.1990 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
29.05.1990 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |