EP0489792 - ONE-HANDED KEYBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATIAS, Edgar 178 Thistledown Blvd. Rexdale Ontario M9V 1K1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states MATIAS, Edgar 178 Thistledown Blvd. Rexdale Ontario M9V 1K1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912914.0 | 29.08.1990 | [1992/25] | WO1990CA00274 | Priority number, date | CA19890609678 | 29.08.1989 Original published format: CA 609678 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103782 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489792 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489792 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023, G09B21/00, B41J5/10 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
G09B21/00 (EP,US);
B41J5/10 (EP,US);
G06F3/0235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/25] | Title | German: | EINHANDTASTATUR | [1992/25] | English: | ONE-HANDED KEYBOARD | [1992/25] | French: | CLAVIER A UNE MAIN | [1992/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB2071578 [ ] (LITTERICK I A N); | US4911565 [ ] (RYAN TERRY [CA]) |