EP0609201 - SIZING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JRT-FINLAND OY Topeeka 44 SF-61800 Kauhajoki / FI | [1994/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHTINEN, Reijo Sööpärintie 28 SF-61800 Kauhajoki / FI | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90913056.9 | 12.09.1990 | [1994/32] | WO1990FI00214 | Priority number, date | FI19890004484 | 22.09.1989 Original published format: FI 894484 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9104147 | Date: | 04.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609201 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609201 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/90 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
B29C48/903 (EP,US);
B29C48/913 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/905 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/32] | Title | German: | EICHUNGSWERKZEUG | [1994/32] | English: | SIZING TOOL | [1994/32] | French: | OUTIL DE CALIBRAGE | [1994/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 03.03.1992 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB959440 ; | [A]US3546745 (BALL LAWRENCE J); | [XY]GB1456222 (PETZETAKIS N G PETZETAKIS M G, et al); | [Y]US4543051 (MAILLEFER CHARLES E [CH]) |