|
13.09.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.08.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
57 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
43 |
|
27.10.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
43 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
121 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
51 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
14 |
|
02.08.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
246 |
|
07.12.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
41 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
41 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
26 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
78 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2000 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.11.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.09.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
97 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
90 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.07.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1997 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1997 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
29 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.02.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.01.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.01.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.12.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.10.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
140 |
|
16.03.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.1992 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1992 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1992 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.1992 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1992 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1991 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.1991 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
132 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
17.10.1990 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |