EP0445255 - USE OF HYALURONIC ACID IN COMBINATION WITH ASCORBIC ACID, ANTITUMOUR AGENTS AND/OR NSAIDs FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/37] | TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS AND DISEASE | ||
[2001/35] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | 19.10.2001 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAGOTEC AG Eptingerstrasse 51 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2000/46] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states JAGOTEC AG Seestrasse 47 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | ||
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states HYAL PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION 8 King Street East Suite 1300 Toronto Ontario M5C 1B5 / CA | ||
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states NORPHARMCO INC. 700 Bay Street, 20th Floor Toronto, Ontario M5G 1Z6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALK, Rudolf, Edgar 57 Rose Park Drive Toronto, Ontario M4T 1R2 / CA | 02 /
ASCULAI, Samuel, S. 53 McCaul Street Apt. 252 Toronto, Ontario M6M 2B6 / CA | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1991/37] | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90914108.7 | 18.09.1990 | [1991/37] | WO1990CA00306 | Priority number, date | CA19890612307 | 21.09.1989 Original published format: CA 612307 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9104058 | Date: | 04.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445255 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445255 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0445255 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/36, A61P35/00 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/13 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/503 (EP,US);
A61K31/54 (EP,US);
A61K31/5415 (EP,US);
A61K31/616 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K31/728 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/715, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1991/37] | A61K47/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HYALURONSÄURE IN KOMBINATION MIT ASCORBINSÄURE, ANTITUMORMITTELN UND/ODER NSAIDs ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2001/35] | English: | USE OF HYALURONIC ACID IN COMBINATION WITH ASCORBIC ACID, ANTITUMOUR AGENTS AND/OR NSAIDs FOR TREATING CANCER | [2001/35] | French: | UTILISATION DE L'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE EN COMBINAISON AVEC DE L'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE, DES AGENTS ANTUMUMORAUX ET/OU DES AINS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2001/35] |
Former [1991/37] | BEHANDLUNG VON PATHOLOGISCHEN ZUSTÄNDEN UND KRANKHEITEN | ||
Former [1991/37] | TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS AND DISEASE | ||
Former [1991/37] | TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ET D'ETATS PATHOLOGIQUES | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/49: (deleted) | EPB 2001/49: (deleted) | EPB 2001/49: (deleted) | EPB 1995/49: Teilanmeldung 95100186.6 eingereicht am 18/09/90 | EPB 1995/49: Divisional application 95100186.6 filed on 18/09/90 | EPB 1995/49: Demande divisionnaire 95100186.6 déposée le 18/09/90 | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95100186.6 / EP0656213 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1996
08.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Gedeon Richter Ltd. Gyömroi ut 19-21 1045 Budapest X / HU Opponent's representative Szabo, George S.A. 3 Oaklands Argyle Road London, W13 0HG / GB | 02
06.09.1996
08.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FIDIA, S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A 35031 ABANO TERME (Padova) / IT Opponent's representative Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1996
08.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Gedeon Richter Ltd. Gyömroi ut 19-21 1045 Budapest X / HU Opponent's representative Szabo, George S.A. 39 Wycherley Crescent Barnet, Herts. EN5 1AP / GB | ||
02
06.09.1996
08.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FIDIA, S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A 35031 ABANO TERME (Padova) / IT Opponent's representative Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | |||
Former [1996/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.1996
08.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Gedeon Richter Ltd. Gyömroi ut 19-21 1045 Budapest X / HU Opponent's representative Lord, Hilton David, et al, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
02
06.09.1996
08.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE FIDIA, S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A 35031 ABANO TERME (Padova) / IT Opponent's representative Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | 26.11.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.12.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 01.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.03.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.03.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.03.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.10.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS62240628 ; | [X]EP0138572 (FIDIA SPA [IT]); | [X]EP0197718 (FIDIA SPA [IT]); | [X]EP0216453 (FIDIA SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0224987 (BIOMATRIX INC [US]); | [Y]EP0245126 (OGISO TARO [JP], et al); | [A]US4711780 (FAHIM MOSTAFA S [US]); | [X]EP0265116 (FIDIA SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP0287210 (MEDICAL RESEARCH INT [GB]); | [YP]EP0380367 (STAFFORD MILLER LTD [GB], et al) | [Y] - SNEADER W. E. ET AL, "Possible mechanism for the action of dimethyl sulfoxide on percutaneous absorption", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19720306), vol. 76, no. 10, Database accession no. 49897F, page 273 | [ ] - J. PHARM., PHAMACOL., (1971), vol. 23 SUPPL, page 252S | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 87-337226, & JPS62240628 A 19871021 (KAO CORP.) |