EP0550432 - Electrical connector structure and method for obtaining an electrical interconnection assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/28] | IMPROVED INTERCONNECTION STRUCTURE AND TEST METHOD | ||
[1996/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHUN, John, R. 56 Brooklands Farm Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5821 / US | 02 /
CALL, Anson, J. 376 Grape Hollow Road Holmes, NY 12531 / US | 03 /
CAPPO, Frances, F. 23 DeGiarmo Hill Road Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 04 /
COLE, Marie, S. 3 Rose Lane Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 05 /
HOEBENER, Karl, G. 401 Innwood Drive Georgetown, TX 78628 / US | 06 /
KLINGEL, Bruno, T. 12 Woodcrest Drive Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | 07 /
MILLIKEN, John, C. P.O. Box 200 Patterson, NY 12563 / US | [1993/52] |
Former [1993/28] | 01 /
BEHUN, John, R. 56 Brooklands Farm Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5821 / US | ||
02 /
CALL, Anson, J. 1106 Hudson Harbour Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12601 / US | |||
03 /
CAPPO, Frances, F. 23 DeGiarmo Hill Road Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | |||
04 /
COLE, Marie, S. 3 Rose Lane Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | |||
05 /
HOEBENER, Karl, G. 401 Innwood Drive Georgetown, TX 78628 / US | |||
06 /
KLINGEL, Bruno, T. 12 Woodcrest Drive Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | |||
07 /
MILLIKEN, John, C. P.O. Box 200 Patterson, NY 12563 / US | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | de Pena, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1994/20] | de Pena, Alain Compagnie IBM France Départ. Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1993/28] | Schuffenecker, Thierry Compagnie IBM France, Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 90915908.9 | 17.10.1990 | [1993/28] | WO1990US05962 | Priority number, date | US19900555120 | 18.07.1990 Original published format: US 555120 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9202039 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550432 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550432 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/98, H01L21/60, H01L23/538 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
H01L25/50 (EP,US);
G01R31/2886 (EP,US);
G01R31/66 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H05K3/3436 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/814 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10234 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10977 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10992 (EP,US);
H05K2203/041 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/814, H01L2924/014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/28] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbinderstruktur und Verfahren, einen elektrischen Verbindungsaufbau zu erhalten | [1996/01] | English: | Electrical connector structure and method for obtaining an electrical interconnection assembly | [1996/01] | French: | Structure de connecteur electrique et procédé pour obtenir un assemblage d'interconnexion electrique | [1996/01] |
Former [1993/28] | VERBESSERTE VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR UND TESTVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1993/28] | IMPROVED INTERCONNECTION STRUCTURE AND TEST METHOD | ||
Former [1993/28] | STRUCTURE D'INTERCONNEXION AMELIOREE ET PROCEDE DE VERIFICATION | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO9007792 [ ] (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | EP0348972 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]); | EP0191434 [ ] (IBM [US]) | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, vol. 32, no. 10B, March 1990, (New York, US), "Encapsulated solder joint for chip mounting", page 480 | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, vol. 22, no. 4, September 1979, (New York, US), J.A. Brody et al.: "Storage and logic errors in dynamic memory devices due to innate radioactive materials in packaging and wafer", pages 1460-1461 | [A] - Solid-State Technology, vol. 22, no. 1, January 1979, (Washington, US), J. Marshall et al.: "Solder bump interconnected, multiple chip, thick film hybrid for 40-character alpha-numeric LCD application", pages 87-93 |