Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0445536

EP0445536 - High strength heat bondable fibre [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FiberVisions, L.P.
1313 North Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19894 / US
[2000/30]
Former [1991/37]For all designated states
HERCULES INCORPORATED
Hercules Plaza
Wilmington Delaware 19894-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kozulla, Randall Earl
1265 Classis Drive
Conyers, Georgia 30208-1221 / US
[1991/37]
Representative(s)Howard, Paul Nicholas , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/33]Howard, Paul Nicholas , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/19]De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1991/37]Wey, Hans-Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
c/o Kanzlei Hansmann, Vogeser und Partner Albert Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
D-81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date91101551.905.02.1991
[1991/37]
Priority number, dateUS1990047489705.02.1990         Original published format: US 474897
[1991/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0445536
Date:11.09.1991
Language:EN
[1991/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0445536
Date:15.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0445536
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0445536
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.1991
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/04, D01F1/10, D01F8/06
[1991/37]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1991/37]
TitleGerman:Heiss-verschweissbare Faser mit hoher Festigkeit[1991/37]
English:High strength heat bondable fibre[1991/37]
French:Fibre ayant une haute ténacité thermosoudable[1991/37]
Examination procedure15.07.1992Examination requested  [1992/38]
21.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1999Fee for grant paid
14.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.02.2001   
J.W. Suominen Oy
29250 Nakkila / FI
Opponent's representative
Matilainen, Mirja Helena
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen AB
Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
 [N/P]
Former [2001/14]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2001   
J.W. Suominen Oy
29250 Nakkila / FI
Opponent's representative
Matilainen, Mirja Helena
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
15.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.11.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.07.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.07.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.01.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
08.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE10.05.2000
CH10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
[2002/02]
Former [2001/11]BE10.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]JP48018519  ;
 [A]JP1092416  ;
 [A]LU34908  ;
 [A]GB738474  (DU PONT);
 [A]EP0279511  (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP], et al)
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, accession no. 74-20083V [11], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-48 018 519 (SEKISUI CHEM. CO., LTD) 08-03-1973,
 [A]  - POLYMER SCIENCE USSR, vol. 29, no. 10, 1987, pages 2351-2357, Pergamon Press PLC, Oxford, GB; O. DURCOVA et al.: "Structure of photooxidized polypropylene fibres",
 [A]  - DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 89-148413 [20], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-1 092 416 (DAIWA SPINNING K.K.) 11-04-1989,
Opposition   - Olivieri P. et al., Thermal bonding - the fastest-growing application for polypropylene staple: success and development. In: 4th International Conference on Polypropylene Fibres and Textiles, 23-25 September 1987,