|
15.06.2005 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Fax filed during the Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2003 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.12.2002 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.11.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1999 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.09.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1999 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.10.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |