EP0459178 - Diaper with sealing cuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VP - SCHICKEDANZ AG Postfach 42 16 D-90022 Nürnberg / DE | [1991/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petranyi, Pal, Dr. Schweriner Strasse 17 W-8500 Nürnberg 90 / DE | 02 /
Lang, Hildegard Haeselerstrasse 22 W-8500 Nürnberg 80 / DE | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1994/01] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Rau, Schneck & Hübner, Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1991/49] | Pohl, Hans Ludwig Hefnersplatz 3 D-8500 Nürnberg 11 / DE | Application number, filing date | 91107277.5 | 04.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | DE19904016864 | 25.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4016864 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459178 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459178 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
A61F13/4942 (EP);
A61F13/4946 (EP);
A61F13/494 (EP);
A61F2013/49031 (EP);
A61F2013/49076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/49] | Title | German: | Windel mit Dichtungsklappen | [1991/49] | English: | Diaper with sealing cuffs | [1991/49] | French: | Couche avec barrières d'étanchéité | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.1991 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 | 20.06.1991 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   04.07.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 05.01.1994 | FR | 05.01.1994 | GB | 05.01.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 05.01.1994 | |
GB | 05.01.1994 | ||
FR | 27.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | GB | 05.01.1994 | |
FR | 27.05.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | GB | 05.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2161059 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO); | [AD]EP0219326 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]US4846825 (ENLOE KENNETH M [US], et al) |