EP0514565 - Adjusting drive with two associated friction members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Geroldshäuser Strasse 15 W-8702 Kleinrinderfeld / DE | [1992/48] | Application number, filing date | 91108179.2 | 21.05.1991 | [1992/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514565 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514565 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/50, E05F15/16, F16D3/70, F16D7/02, F16H55/14, F16D3/50 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
F16D7/021 (EP,US);
E05F11/505 (EP,US);
E05F15/697 (EP,US);
F16D3/50 (EP,US);
F16H55/14 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/522 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/21 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/48] | Title | German: | Verstellantrieb mit zwei Reibpartnern | [1992/48] | English: | Adjusting drive with two associated friction members | [1992/48] | French: | Commande de déplacement avec deux membres associés à friction | [1992/48] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 03.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE8903714U ; | [A]US2479278 (TESSENDORF DRAPER E, et al); | [A]WO8600380 (CLEVELAND MOTIVE PROD INC [US]); | [A]FR2193441 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |