EP0477706 - Asynchronous state machine synchronization circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/14] | Asynchronous state machine synchronization circuit and method | ||
[1996/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95051-8090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive P.O. Box 58090 Santa Clara California 95051-8090 / US | ||
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 1090 Kifer Road, M/S 16-135 Sunnyvale, CA 95086-3737 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leung, Frederick Kwok-Yin 11522 Country Spring Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Henderson, Richard Dean 215 Bartlett Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115629.7 | 14.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | US19900588696 | 27.09.1990 Original published format: US 588696 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477706 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477706 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477706 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/037, H03K17/693 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
H03K3/0375 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/14] | H03K3/037 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/14] | Title | German: | Schaltung zum Synchronisieren von asynchronen Zustandsmaschinen | [1996/31] | English: | Asynchronous state machine synchronization circuit | [1996/31] | French: | Circuit de synchronisation pour machines à états asynchrones | [1996/31] |
Former [1992/14] | Schaltung und Verfahren zum Synchronisieren von asynchronen Zustandsmaschinen | ||
Former [1992/14] | Asynchronous state machine synchronization circuit and method | ||
Former [1992/14] | Circuit et procédé de synchronisation pour machines à états asynchrones | Examination procedure | 03.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.1996 | IT | 31.07.1996 | GB | 31.10.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 31.07.1996 | |
IT | 31.07.1996 | ||
GB | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 31.07.1996 | |
GB | 31.10.1996 | ||
FR | 27.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | GB | 31.10.1996 | |
FR | 27.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | FR | 27.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2091965 (PHILIPS NV); | [X]EP0058752 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0308294 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]); | [Y]US4851710 (GRIVNA EDWARD L [US]); | [X]EP0382292 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) |