EP0484795 - Electric shaving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labrijn, Hans c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Newman, Frank Harold Charles c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91118391.1 | 29.10.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | NL19900002400 | 05.11.1990 Original published format: NL 9002400 | [1992/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484795 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/38, B26B19/14 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
B26B19/145 (EP);
B26B19/14 (EP);
B26B19/38 (EP);
B26B19/382 (EP);
B26B19/3846 (EP);
B26B19/3873 (EP);
B26B19/3886 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/20] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Rasierapparat | [1992/20] | English: | Electric shaving apparatus | [1992/20] | French: | Rasoir électrique | [1992/20] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/28] | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4711028 ; | [Y]GB2129731 |