|
19.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.1999 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.1999 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
30.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.06.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1997 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.06.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1997 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.1997 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.02.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1997 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.10.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.07.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
30.12.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1994 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1994 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.07.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |