EP0483874 - Apparatus for recording digital picture data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/19] | Apparatus for recording and reproducing digital picture data | ||
[1999/05] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Yukio c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Senshu, Yoichirou c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Uetake, Akihiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hasegawa, Shinichi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kawaguchi, Moriyuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Inoue, Hajime c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Seki, Takahito c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Kanota, Keiji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Kondo, Tetsujiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Honda, Naoki, c/o Sony Magnetic Products, Inc. 5-6 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Kiwit, Benedikt, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/19] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33, Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118663.3 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | JP19900294671 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29467190 | JP19900306703 | 13.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30670390 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0483874 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0483874 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483874 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/79 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP);
G11B15/615 (EP);
G11B20/00007 (EP);
G11B20/1833 (EP);
G11B23/087 (EP);
G11B5/0086 (EP);
G11B5/00873 (EP);
G11B5/09 (EP);
H04N19/98 (EP);
H04N5/782 (EP);
H04N9/806 (EP);
H04N5/78263 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/19] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Aufzeichnung von digitalen Bilddaten | [1999/05] | English: | Apparatus for recording digital picture data | [1999/05] | French: | Dispositif pour enregistrer des données d'images digitales | [1999/05] |
Former [1992/19] | Einrichtung zur Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe von digitalen Bilddaten | ||
Former [1992/19] | Apparatus for recording and reproducing digital picture data | ||
Former [1992/19] | Dispositif pour enregistrer et reproduire des données d'images digitales | Examination procedure | 12.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2009 | GB | 31.10.2009 | IT | 31.10.2009 | ES | 01.11.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | DE | 01.05.2010 | NL | 01.05.2010 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/35] | AT | 31.10.2009 | |
GB | 31.10.2009 | ||
IT | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
NL | 01.05.2010 | ||
ES | 01.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 31.10.2009 | |
GB | 31.10.2009 | ||
IT | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
NL | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 31.10.2009 | |
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2010 | ||
NL | 01.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0121384 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X] - 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VIDEO, AUDIO AND DATA RECORDING March 1988, YORK, GB pages 219 - 226 KONDO ET AL 'ADAPTIVE DYNAMIC RANGE CODING SCHEME FOR FUTURE CONSUMER DIGITAL VTR' | [X] - YAMAMITSU C., ET AL., "AN EXPERIMENTAL STUDY FOR A HOME-USE DIGITAL VTR.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19890801), vol. 35., no. 03., doi:10.1109/30.44303, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 450 - 457., XP000065969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.44303 | [A] - CHOJURO YAMAMITSU, ET AL., "AN EXPERIMENTAL STUDY ON BIT RATE REDUCTION AND HIGH DENSITY RECORDING FOR A HOME-USE DIGITAL VTR.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19880801), vol. 34., no. 03., doi:10.1109/30.20158, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 588 - 595., XP000111199 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.20158 |