|
16.03.2000 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2000 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.1999 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1999 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1999 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.12.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.1998 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1998 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1997 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.06.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1997 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.03.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1995 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1995 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
20 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1995 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.08.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
18.04.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |