EP0490200 - Derivatives of quinoline carboxylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schloesser, Ulrike, Dr. Pigagestrasse 6 W-6800 Mannheim 81 / DE | 02 /
Wagenblast, Gerhard, Dr. Bachweg 8 W-6719 Weisenheim / DE | [1992/25] | Application number, filing date | 91120615.9 | 29.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | DE19904039298 | 10.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4039298 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490200 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490200 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/50, B41M5/136 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
B41M5/136 (EP,US);
C07D215/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/25] | Title | German: | Derivate von Chinolincarbonsäuren | [1992/25] | English: | Derivatives of quinoline carboxylic acid | [1992/25] | French: | Dérivés d'acide carboxylique de quinoléine | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3405395 (YAMADA CHEM CO [JP]); | [A]EP0256180 (YAMADA CHEM CO [JP]); | [YD]EP0384313 (BASF AG [DE]) |