EP0490317 - Active carbon materials, process for the preparation thereof and the use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Hisaki 5063-1, Okinamachi-2-chome, Niigata-shi Niigata-Ken, 951 / JP | 02 /
Kondoh, Toshio 4-14, Koyo-1-chome Niigata-shi / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Hideki 3412-1, Matsuhamacho Niigata-shi / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Mayumi 386, Nishino Niigata-shi / JP | 05 /
Aoyama, Tetsuo 15-3, Nakayama-1-chome Niigata-shi / JP | 06 /
Miyake, Masahiro 3412-2, Matsuhamacho Niigata-shi / JP | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121089.6 | 09.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | JP19900410091 | 13.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41009190 | JP19900410092 | 13.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41009290 | JP19910169003 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: JP 16900391 | JP19910293239 | 08.11.1991 Original published format: JP 29323991 | JP19910293240 | 08.11.1991 Original published format: JP 29324091 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490317 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490317 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/18, B01J20/20, C01B31/08 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
B01J21/18 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/30 (KR);
B01J20/20 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/25] | Title | German: | Aktivkohlesubstanz, Herstellungsverfahren und Anwendung | [1992/25] | English: | Active carbon materials, process for the preparation thereof and the use thereof | [1992/25] | French: | Charbon actif, procédé de préparation et utilisation | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52105594 ; | [A]JP56048290 ; | [A]US4832881 (ARNOLD JR CHARLES [US], et al); | [A]US4118341 (ISHIBASHI KATSUJI, et al); | [A]WO8103167 (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD [GB], et al); | [A]DE3119707 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]); | [A]FR2231621 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4298578 (YAN TSOUNG-YUAN, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1, no. 166 (C-77)27 December 1977 & JP-A-52 105 594 ( AJINOMOTO ) 9 May 1977, & JP52105594 A 19770509 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 106 (C-62)(778) 10 July 1981 & JP-A-56 048 290 ( TAKI KAGAKU ) 1 May 1981, & JP56048290 A 19810501 |