|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.03.2002 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2002 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.02.2002 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2002 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2002 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2000 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.08.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1998 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1997 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.09.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
23.02.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
09.09.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |