EP0482681 - Convertible automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benedetto, Carmelo Viale Papiniano, 57 I-20123 Milan / IT | 02 /
Bertelli, Alberto Via Oglio, 28 I-20139 Milan / IT | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Henke, Erwin, et al Ing.Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Henke, Erwin, et al Ing.Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91202156.5 | 23.08.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | IT19900021536 | 21.09.1990 Original published format: IT 2153690 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482681 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482681 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/08, B60J7/20 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
B60J7/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | Automobil mit beweglichem Dach | [1994/44] | English: | Convertible automobile | [1992/18] | French: | Voiture décapotable | [1992/18] |
Former [1992/18] | Kraftfahrzeug mit öffenbarem Dach | Examination procedure | 07.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.11.1994 | SE | 02.02.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1996/03] | SE | 02.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2159973 (PININFARINA SPA CARROZZERIA); | [A]CH650980 (PAUL ROLLMAN); | [A]DE3623468 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al); | [A]DE3639376 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) |