|
04.04.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Annex |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
19 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.01.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1998 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1998 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.07.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1998 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1998 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
02.01.1998 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.04.1996 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.03.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.04.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.1994 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
16.09.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.06.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.1991 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
07.05.1991 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |