EP0447263 - Retractable container holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgess, Martin 11 Stanley Avenue Beckenham, Kent BR3 2PU / GB | 02 /
Percy, John A.G. 2 Huntsmans Drive Upminster, Essex RM14 3YU / GB | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302266.1 | 15.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | GB19900005790 | 15.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9005790 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447263 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447263 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447263 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60N3/10 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
B60N3/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/38] | Title | German: | Einschiebbarer Behälterträger | [1991/38] | English: | Retractable container holder | [1991/38] | French: | Support rétractable de récipients | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 02.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.11.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/41] | FR | 07.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2649270 (FRANKS ALTON L); | [A]DE1944604 (NICCOLI VITTORIO, et al); | [A]US3817190 (EVANGELISTA H); | [AD]WO8404072 (PRATT MICHAEL J); | [A]US4733908 (DYKSTRA RONALD A [US], et al); | [A]US4907775 (LORENCE BRIAN S [US], et al) |