EP0453159 - Synthesis of (S)-3-(thien-2-ylthio)butyric acid analogs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blacklock, Thomas J. 493 Valley Road Clark, NJ 07066 / US | 02 /
Shinkai, Ichiro 1101 Prospect Street Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303136.5 | 09.04.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | US19900510805 | 16.04.1990 Original published format: US 510805 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453159 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/34 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
C07D333/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/43] | Title | German: | Synthese von (S)-3-(thien-2-ylthio)Butansäurederivaten | [1991/43] | English: | Synthesis of (S)-3-(thien-2-ylthio)butyric acid analogs | [1991/43] | French: | Synthèse des dérivés d'analogues d'acide (S)-3-(thien-2-ylthio)butyrique | [1991/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 22.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4797413 (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al) | [Y] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, vol. 70, 1987, pages 1326-1332; A. GRIESBECK et al.: "121. Herstellung enantiomerenreiner Derivate von 3-Amino- und 3-Mercaptobuttersäure durch Sn2-Ringöffnung des beta-lactons und eines 1,3-Dioxanons aus der 3-Hydroxybuttersäure" |