|
13.04.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.07.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
All other documents for the Appeal procedure not covered by any other Code |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.12.2003 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.08.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Board of Appeal mail |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.02.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.07.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.07.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.03.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.03.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.08.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.07.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.05.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.05.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
29 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.02.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.1991 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |