EP0511438 - Printing in data processing systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Speed, Robin Charles Bentnick 6 Victoria Road Winchester, Hampshire SO23 7DU / GB | [1992/45] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303919.4 | 30.04.1991 | [1992/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0511438 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/02 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
G06K15/02 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/45] | Title | German: | Drucken im Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1992/45] | English: | Printing in data processing systems | [1992/45] | French: | Impression par système de traitement de donnée | [1992/45] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/12] | 03.11.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0119395 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0298686 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0298660 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0335211 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4991972 (IKENOUE YOSHIKAZU [US], et al) |