|
25.11.2004 |
Closing of application |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
05.05.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Fax filed during the Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.10.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2003 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
18.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.01.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
28 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.11.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.11.1999 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.10.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1999 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.08.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.08.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
30 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
74 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
49 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1997 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
106 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
122 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
07.03.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1995 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1995 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1995 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
01.11.1991 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1991 |
Deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |