|
15.07.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.06.2003 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.04.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2000 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2000 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1999 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.03.1999 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.10.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.07.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.01.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.08.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.05.1996 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
06.09.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |