EP0490553 - High-speed emitter-coupled logic buffer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1992/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandez, Francisco Javier P.O. Box 13729 Reading, Pennsylvania 19612 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311197.7 | 02.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900625515 | 11.12.1990 Original published format: US 625515 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490553 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490553 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/086 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
H03K19/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/25] | Title | German: | Schneller ECL-Puffer | [1992/25] | English: | High-speed emitter-coupled logic buffer | [1992/25] | French: | Tampon logique ECL à grande vitesse | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 14.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0453185 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) |