EP0490640 - Electronic devices, particularly for use as electro-optic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken, 243 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiroki, Masaaki 533-13, Shirane Isehara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 259-11 / JP | 02 /
Mase, Akira 3-3, 381-1, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 243 / JP | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91311477.3 | 10.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | JP19900415722 | 10.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41572290 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490640 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L21/84, G09G3/36 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
H01L27/1214 (EP,US);
G02F1/136 (KR);
G02F1/13624 (EP,US);
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G09G3/3659 (EP,US);
G09G3/3677 (EP,US);
G09G3/3688 (EP,US);
G02F1/136245 (EP,US);
G02F1/136259 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0823 (EP,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,US);
G09G2330/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/25] | Title | German: | Elektronische Anordnungen, insbesondere für die Anwendung als elektro-optische Vorrichtungen | [1992/25] | English: | Electronic devices, particularly for use as electro-optic devices | [1992/25] | French: | Dispositifs électroniques, particulièrement pour utilisation comme dispositifs électro-optiques | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/06] | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/10] | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0375233 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [X]US4917467 (CHEN HSIUNG-KU [TW], et al); | [A]US4332075 (OTA ISAO, et al); | [A]DE3604368 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 219 9 May 1990 | [X] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, SUPPLEMENTS. vol. 22, no. 22-1, 1983, TOKYO JA pages 497 - 500; M. MATSUI ET AL.: 'A 10x10 polycrystalline-silicon thin-film transistor matrix for liquid.crystal display' |