EP0474555 - Multi-media communication apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/11] | Multi-media communication apparatus | ||
[1997/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maekawa, Yoshito, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402365.0 | 04.09.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | JP19900236848 | 05.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23684890 | JP19910128360 | 01.05.1991 Original published format: JP 12836091 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0474555 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0474555 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474555 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04M15/30, H04M15/04 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
H04M15/44 (EP,US);
H04M1/27475 (EP,US);
H04M1/575 (EP,US);
H04M1/576 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/58 (EP,US);
H04M15/68 (EP,US);
H04M3/36 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0471 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0104 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0188 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0196 (EP,US);
H04M2250/60 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/091 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13096 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13174 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13248 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13337 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/171 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/332 (EP,US);
Y10S379/908 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/11] | H04Q11/04, H04M15/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/11] | Title | German: | Medienverbundkommunikationsanordnung und Verfahren | [1997/52] | English: | Multi-media communication apparatus and method | [1997/52] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de communication multi-média | [1997/52] |
Former [1992/11] | Medienverbundkommunikationsanordnung | ||
Former [1992/11] | Multi-media communication apparatus | ||
Former [1992/11] | Dispositif de communication multi-média | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/52: (deleted) | EPB 1997/52: (deleted) | EPB 1997/52: (deleted) | EPB 1997/37: Teilanmeldung 97109745.6 eingereicht am 16/06/97 | EPB 1997/37: Divisional application 97109745.6 filed on 16/06/97 | EPB 1997/37: Demande divisionnaire 97109745.6 déposée le 16/06/97 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97109745.6 / EP0809411 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61039766 ; | [X]EP0238256 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]US4813065 (SEGALA JAMES J [US]); | [Y]US4902881 (JANKU JAN A [US]); | [XP]EP0412298 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [Y] - TELCOM. REPORT, vol. 9, no. 2, March 1986, pages 138-142, Munich, DE; K. RICHTER: "Mehr Transparenz bei Telefongebühren" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 197 (E-418)[2253], 10th July 1986; & JP-A-61 039 766 (NEC) 25-02-1986, & JP61039766 A 00000000 |