EP0477068 - Exhaust system for building façades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOUCHIER FAGES Z.I. Nord - Torcy B.P. 2 F-77201 Marne La Vallée Cédex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states SOUCHIER FAGES Z.I. Nord - Torcy B.P. 2 F-77201 Marne La Vallée Cédex 1 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parisot, Jean-Pierre 1, Rue du Haut, Le Charnois F-77515 Pommeuse / FR | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Armengaud Ainé, Alain Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402425.2 | 12.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | FR19900011456 | 17.09.1990 Original published format: FR 9011456 | [1992/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477068 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477068 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477068 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
F24F13/1426 (EP);
F24F13/14 (EP);
F24F2013/1433 (EP);
F24F2013/146 (EP);
F24F2013/1466 (EP);
F24F2013/1473 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/13] | Title | German: | Entlüftungsvorrichtung für Gebäudefassaden | [1992/13] | English: | Exhaust system for building façades | [1992/13] | French: | Système de désenfumage pour façades de bâtiment | [1992/13] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.1994 | ES | 13.03.1995 | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/02] | IT | 30.11.1994 | |
ES | 13.03.1995 | ||
Former [2004/03] | IT | 30.11.1994 | |
ES | 13.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0324256 | Examination | EP0304753 | EP0430721 |